NH HB1703 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 40
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 40
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the requirements for directors of licensed practical nurse education programs.
Title
Relative to the requirements for directors of licensed practical nurse education programs.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Eaton [D] | Rep. Paul Berch [D] | Sen. Jay Kahn [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 40 |
2018-02-23 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 12-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 22 |
2018-02-22 | House | Executive Session: 02/01/2018 Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 02/01/2018 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-11-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 P. 20 |