NH HB1698 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-01 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 22-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-01 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 22-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to equal access and opportunity for students with disabilities to participate in co-curricular activities and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Relative to equal access and opportunity for students with disabilities to participate in co-curricular activities and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Sen. Timothy Lang [R] | Rep. Sue Mullen [D] | Sen. Howard Pearl [R] | Rep. Reed Panasiti [R] |
Sen. David Watters [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-01 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 22-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 5 |
2020-05-14 | House | Executive Session: 05/21/2020 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using this link: https://www.zoom.us/j/91769986281 |
2020-03-04 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 03/18/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2020-02-24 | House | Division I Work Session: 03/03/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 209 |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Finance 02/13/2020 House Journal 3 P. 26 |
2020-02-13 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/13/2020 House Journal 3 P. 26 |
2020-02-13 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Sylvia) 02/13/2020 House Journal 3 P. 2 |
2020-01-29 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/13/2020 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 2 |
2020-01-22 | House | Executive Session: 01/28/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 207 |
2020-01-14 | House | Public Hearing: 01/21/2020 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 207 |
2020-01-06 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 32 |