NH HB1698 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 42
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 42
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to an integrative approach to substance abuse disorders.
Title
Relative to an integrative approach to substance abuse disorders.
Sponsors
Rep. Valerie Fraser [R] | Rep. Catherine Cheney [R] | Rep. Suzanne Smith [D] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] |
Rep. Claire Rouillard [R] | Rep. Lynne Ober [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-09 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 42 |
2016-02-25 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/09/2016 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 24 |
2016-02-17 | House | Executive Session: 02/17/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2016-01-27 | House | Public Hearing: 02/03/2016 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2016-01-13 | House | Introduced 01/07/2016 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 6 P. 43 |