NH HB1695 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to payment for child care services by the department of health and human services.
Title
Relative to payment for child care services by the department of health and human services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 6 |
2018-01-31 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/07/2018 (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 9 |
2018-01-26 | House | Executive Session: 01/25/2018 Legislative Office Building 205 |
2018-01-23 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 01/25/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/10/2018 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2017-11-13 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 1 P. 20 |