NH HB1693 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Extending the committee to study whether non-attorney legal professionals could be licensed to engage in the limited practice of law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extending the committee to study whether non-attorney legal professionals could be licensed to engage in the limited practice of law.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-16SenateIntroduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
2020-03-11HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 41
2020-03-05HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/11/2020 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 23
2020-02-05HouseExecutive Session: 03/04/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2020-01-16HousePublic Hearing: 01/28/2020 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 208
2020-01-06HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 1 P. 32

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback