NH HB169 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2023 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2023 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to termination of guardianship.
Title
Relative to termination of guardianship.
Sponsors
Rep. Jonathan Smith [R] | Rep. Glenn Cordelli [R] | Rep. John MacDonald [R] | Rep. Karel Crawford [R] |
Rep. Anita Burroughs [D] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-14 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2023 House Journal 5 |
2023-02-08 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB169 02/01/2023 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 8 |
2023-01-24 | House | Executive Session: 01/30/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/18/2023 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-01-03 | House | Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Judiciary |