NH HB169 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB169
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on December 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-27 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 01/03/2018 (Vote 23-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-27 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 01/03/2018 (Vote 23-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to limits on wagers in charitable games of chance.
Title
Relative to limits on wagers in charitable games of chance.
Sponsors
Rep. James Spillane [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] | Rep. Josh Moore [R] | Rep. Jess Edwards [R] |
Rep. Daniel Itse [R] | Rep. Victoria Sullivan [R] | Sen. Andy Sanborn [R] | Rep. Carol McGuire [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-27 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 01/03/2018 (Vote 23-0; Consent Calendar) |
2017-10-12 | House | Executive Session: 10/25/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-08-09 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/12/2017 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-02-28 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-02-28 | House | Executive Session: 02/28/2017 Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-02-15 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/22/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-02-08 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/21/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-02-02 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/15/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-01-19 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/26/2017 12:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/19/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2016-12-28 | House | Introduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 2 P. 19 |
Same As/Similar To
HB169 (Carry Over) 2017-10-27 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 01/03/2018 (Vote 23-0; Consent Calendar)