NH HB169 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB169
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-18 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/14/2018; Chapter 265; Eff. 6/14/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-18 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/14/2018; Chapter 265; Eff. 6/14/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to limits on wagers in charitable games of chance.
Title
Relative to limits on wagers in charitable games of chance.
Sponsors
Rep. James Spillane [R] | Rep. Carol McGuire [R] | Rep. Victoria Sullivan [R] | Rep. Josh Moore [R] |
Rep. Jess Edwards [R] | Rep. Daniel Itse [R] | Sen. Andy Sanborn [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 6 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-18 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/14/2018; Chapter 265; Eff. 6/14/2018 |
2018-06-05 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2018 |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-23 | House | Conference Committee Report 2015c: Adopted, Voice Vote 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2018-2015c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2018; Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Filed, # 2018-2015c; 05/17/2018 |
2018-05-14 | House | Conferee Change: Rep. Malloy Replaces Rep. Almy 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-10 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 05/15/2018 03:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Sanborn, French, Feltes; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Sen. Sanborn Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-10 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Abrami, Almy, Ohm, Lang 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-10 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1896s and Requests CofC (Rep. Major): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-1896s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Sen. French Floor Amendment # 2018-1896s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Sen. French Moved Ought to Pass; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 6Y-18N, Motion Failed; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 05/03/2018; |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Special Order to 05/03/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/02/2018 Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 05/02/2018; Senate Calendar 19A |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Special Order to the present time, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/26/2018; Senate Calendar 18 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Hearing: 03/14/2018, Room 100, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 11 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Introduced 02/01/2018 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 4 |
2018-01-03 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 46 |
2017-10-27 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 01/03/2018 (Vote 23-0; Consent Calendar) |
2017-10-12 | House | Executive Session: 10/25/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-08-09 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/12/2017 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-02-28 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-02-28 | House | Executive Session: 02/28/2017 Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-02-15 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/22/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-02-08 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/21/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-02-02 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/15/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-01-19 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/26/2017 12:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/19/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2016-12-28 | House | Introduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 2 P. 19 |
Same As/Similar To
HB169 (Carry Over) 2017-10-27 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 01/03/2018 (Vote 23-0; Consent Calendar)