NH HB1688 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 182
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 182
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to governmental liability for negligence claims.
Title
Relative to governmental liability for negligence claims.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 182 |
2016-03-03 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/09/2016 (Vote 18-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 63 |
2016-02-25 | House | Executive Session: 03/01/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2016-02-10 | House | Public Hearing: 02/17/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 4 P. 23 |