NH HB1684 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing an energy conservation program and an energy conservation project fund and establishing the state PACE reserve fund.
Title
Establishing an energy conservation program and an energy conservation project fund and establishing the state PACE reserve fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Died on Table |
2020-02-19 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Backus): Motion Adopted DV 316-5 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 87 |
2020-02-13 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2020-02-13 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0499h (NT) for 02/19/2020 (Vote 11-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 26 |
2020-02-04 | House | Executive Session: 02/12/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2020-01-22 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/23/2020 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2020-01-10 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2020 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-12-30 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 1 P. 31 |