NH HB1683 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 58
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 58
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to lowering the interest rate and costs for the redemption and repurchase of property subject to a tax lien or tax deed.
Title
Relative to lowering the interest rate and costs for the redemption and repurchase of property subject to a tax lien or tax deed.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Hull [R] | Rep. Keith Ammon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-09 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 58 |
2016-02-17 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/09/2016 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 37 |
2016-01-27 | House | Executive Session: 02/02/2016 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2016-01-12 | House | Public Hearing: 01/21/2016 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building301 |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 4 P. 23 |