NH HB1671 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - House Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. Ladd): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/12/2022 House Journal 13
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the content of an adequate education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the content of an adequate education.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-13HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. Ladd): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/12/2022 House Journal 13
2022-04-21SenateCommittee Amendment # 2022-1547s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9
2022-04-21SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2022-1547s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9
2022-04-14SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1547s, 04/21/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 16
2022-04-06SenateHearing: 04/12/2022, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 15
2022-03-22SenateIntroduced 03/17/2022 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 6
2022-03-16HouseAmendment # 2022-1024h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6
2022-03-15HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2022-1024h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6
2022-03-09HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1024h (Vote 18-1; Consent Calendar)
2022-02-03HousePublic Hearing: 01/27/2022 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
2022-02-03HousePublic Hearing: 02/15/2022 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
2022-01-19House==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 02/04/2022 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
2021-12-30HouseIntroduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Education

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback