NH HB1668 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-07 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.1305
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-07 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.1305
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to an individual's right to access to all state government files concerning the individual.
Title
Relative to an individual's right to access to all state government files concerning the individual.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-07 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.1305 | |
2012-02-22 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 7 (Vote 12-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 18, PG.1067 | |
2012-02-15 | House Executive Session: 2/21/2012 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2012-02-09 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/16/2012 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2012-01-10 | House Public Hearing: 2/9/2012 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2011-12-30 | House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 7, PG.363 |