NH HB1663 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Reconsider (Rep. White): Motion Failed Voice Vote 03/09/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Reconsider (Rep. White): Motion Failed Voice Vote 03/09/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting buying, selling, and experimenting on unborn infants or bodily remains resulting from abortion.
Title
Prohibiting buying, selling, and experimenting on unborn infants or bodily remains resulting from abortion.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-09 - House - ITL (Y: 155 N: 122 NV: 96 Abs: 24) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | Reconsider (Rep. White): Motion Failed Voice Vote 03/09/2016 |
2016-03-10 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 155-122 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 177 |
2016-03-03 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/09/2016 (Vote 10-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 62 |
2016-03-02 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/02/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2016-03-02 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 03/01/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2016-02-10 | House | Public Hearing: 02/17/2016 03:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 4 P. 22 |