NH HB1659 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2016 House Journal 25 P. 47
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2016 House Journal 25 P. 47
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the implementation of the clean power state implementation plan.
Title
Relative to the implementation of the clean power state implementation plan.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2016 House Journal 25 P. 47 |
2016-03-01 | House | Minority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study House Calendar 14 P. 72 |
2016-03-01 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/09/2016 (Vote 20-1; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 72 |
2016-02-16 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/16/2016 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2016-02-16 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/12/2016 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2016-01-27 | House | Public Hearing: 02/02/2016 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 4 P. 22 |