NH HB1654 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to previous convictions for driving while intoxicated.
Title
Relative to previous convictions for driving while intoxicated.
Sponsors
Sen. Daryl Abbas [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Died on Table |
2020-02-20 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Ley): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/20/2020 House Journal 5 P. 9 |
2020-02-03 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2020-02-03 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/19/2020 (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 29 |
2020-01-09 | House | Executive Session: 01/28/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2020-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-12-13 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 1 P. 30 |