NH HB1651 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/25/2018; Chapter 84; Eff. 5/25/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/25/2018; Chapter 84; Eff. 5/25/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study the use of liquid de-icers and solid salt on roads.
Title
Establishing a committee to study the use of liquid de-icers and solid salt on roads.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-29 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/25/2018; Chapter 84; Eff. 5/25/2018 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/26/2018); Senate Journal 15 |
2018-05-01 | House | Enrolled 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-19 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1163s (Rep. Steven Smith): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 2 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-1163s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/05/2018; Senate Journal 11 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-1163s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/05/2018; Senate Journal 11 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1163s, 04/05/2018; Senate Calendar 15 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Hearing: 03/06/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 02:15 pm; Senate Calendar 9 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Introduced 02/15/2018 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 5 |
2018-02-08 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 16 |
2018-01-24 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/07/2018 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 17 |
2018-01-24 | House | Executive Session: 01/23/2018 Legislative Office Building 203 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/10/2018 03:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2017-11-13 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Transportation House Journal 1 P. 18 |