NH HB1649 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on December 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/13/2020 House Journal 3 P. 19
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/13/2020 House Journal 3 P. 19
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a road usage fee and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Establishing a road usage fee and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - House - OTPA (Y: 144 N: 173 NV: 28 Abs: 51) [FAIL]
2020-02-13 - House - Table (Y: 120 N: 206 NV: 20 Abs: 50) [FAIL]
2020-02-13 - House - Table (Y: 120 N: 206 NV: 20 Abs: 50) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/13/2020 House Journal 3 P. 19 |
2020-02-13 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0168h: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 144-173 02/13/2020 House Journal 3 P. 19 |
2020-02-13 | House | Amendment # 2020-0168h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/13/2020 House Journal 3 P. 19 |
2020-02-13 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Bordy): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 120-206 02/13/2020 House Journal 3 P. 19 |
2020-01-30 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0168h for 02/13/2020 (Vote 17-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 7 |
2020-01-22 | House | Executive Session: 01/28/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2020-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 01/21/2020 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 201 |
2019-12-12 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Public Works and Highways House Journal 1 P. 30 |