NH HB1644 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 12 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to information required on marriage licenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to information required on marriage licenses.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-23HouseDied on Table
2020-03-12HouseLay on Table (Rep. Goley): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 104
2020-03-05HouseCommittee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 03/11/2020 (Vote 16-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 56
2020-02-18House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/03/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306
2020-02-05House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/12/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306
2020-01-28HousePublic Hearing: 02/05/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306
2019-12-12HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 P. 30

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback