NH HB1641 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-06 - Interim Study Full Committee Work Session: 06/22/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-06 - Interim Study Full Committee Work Session: 06/22/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to vessel registration fees.
Title
Relative to vessel registration fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | House | Interim Study Full Committee Work Session: 06/22/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2022-02-16 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-02-08 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-02-02 | House | Executive Session: 02/02/2022 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building305-307 |
2022-01-26 | House | Public Hearing: 01/26/2022 11:15 a.m. Legislative Office Building305-307 |
2021-12-27 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development |