NH HB1637 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-16 - Veto Sustained 06/16/2016: Regular Calendar 147-105 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-16 - Veto Sustained 06/16/2016: Regular Calendar 147-105 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to school attendance in towns with no public schools.
Title
Relative to school attendance in towns with no public schools.
Sponsors
Rep. Ralph Boehm [R] | Rep. Suzanne Gottling [D] | Rep. Virginia Irwin [D] | Rep. Frank Edelblut [R] |
Rep. James Grenier [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-16 - House - Veto Override (Y: 147 N: 105 NV: 107 Abs: 32) [FAIL]
2016-06-01 - Senate - Committee of Conference Report 2093c (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - House - Adopt CofC Report (Y: 190 N: 132 NV: 46 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Senate - Committee of Conference Report 2093c (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - House - Adopt CofC Report (Y: 190 N: 132 NV: 46 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-16 | House | Veto Sustained 06/16/2016: Regular Calendar 147-105 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote |
2016-06-13 | House | Vetoed by Governor Hassan 06/09/2016 |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/01/2016); Senate Journal 20 |
2016-06-08 | House | Enrolled 06/01/2016 |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2016-2135e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/01/2016); Senate Journal 20 |
2016-06-07 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2016-2135e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2016 House Journal 42 P. 62 |
2016-06-01 | House | Conference Committee Report 2093c: Adopted, Regular Calendar 190-132 06/01/2016 House Journal 42 P. 50 |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 2093c; Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Adopted; 06/01/2016 Senate Journal 19 |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Filed, #2016-2093c; 05/26/2016 |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Conferee Change; Senator Morse Replaces Senator Watters |
2016-05-24 | House | ==CONTINUED== Conference Committee Meeting: 05/25/2016 02:45 PM Legislative Office Building 104 |
2016-05-20 | House | ==RECESSED== Conference Committee Meeting: 05/24/2016 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2016-05-19 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Bradley, Reagan, Watters; 05/19/2016; Senate Journal 18 |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Sen. Reagan Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/19/2016; Senate Journal 18 |
2016-05-19 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Ladd, Hinch, Jasper, Packard 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 3 |
2016-05-19 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1736s and Requests CofC (Rep. Ladd): Motion Adopted DV 178-137 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 3 |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1736s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/05/2016; Senate Journal 16 |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Sen. Reagan Floor Amendment #2016-1736s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/05/2016; Senate Journal 16 |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Sen. Stiles Moved Ought to Pass; 05/05/2016 Senate Journal 16 |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; 05/05/2016; Senate Journal 16 |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 05/05/2016; Senate Calendar 17 |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Special Order HB 1637 to 05/05/2016, Without Objection, Motion Adopted Senate Journal 15 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 04/28/2016; Senate Calendar 16 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Hearing: 04/12/2016, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 14 |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Introduced 03/24/2016 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 11 |
2016-03-23 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0878h: Motion Adopted DV 208-143 03/23/2016 House Journal 27 P. 38 |
2016-03-23 | House | Amendment #2016-0878h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/23/2016 House Journal 27 P. 38 |
2016-03-11 | House | Special Order to calendar of 3/23/2016: Motion Adopted DV 275-25 By Necessary Two-Thirds Vote 03/10/2016 House Journal 25 P. 117 |
2016-03-03 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate House Calendar 14 P. 92 |
2016-03-03 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0878h for 03/09/2016 (Vote 12-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 92 |
2016-01-28 | House | Executive Session: 03/01/2016 09:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2016-01-27 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 02/12/2016 09:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2016-01-27 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 02/11/2016 09:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building207 |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Education House Journal 4 P. 21 |