NH HB1637 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-07 - House Referred to Education for Interim Study; House Calendar 45, PG.2432
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-07 - House Referred to Education for Interim Study; House Calendar 45, PG.2432
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing a school district which uses official ballot voting to conduct a special meeting necessitated by changes in adequate education funding.
Title
Authorizing a school district which uses official ballot voting to conduct a special meeting necessitated by changes in adequate education funding.
Sponsors
Rep. Lynne Ober [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-07 | House Referred to Education for Interim Study; House Calendar 45, PG.2432 | |
2012-03-07 | House Refer to Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.1301 | |
2012-02-23 | House Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Mar 7 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 18, PG.1064 | |
2012-01-12 | House Executive Session: 2/21/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 | |
2012-01-11 | House Public Hearing: 2/16/2012 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 207 | |
2011-12-20 | House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Education; House Journal 7, PG. 362 |