NH HB1636 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 187-132 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 48
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 187-132 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 48
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to special education services for children in charter schools.
Title
Relative to special education services for children in charter schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 187-132 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 48 |
2020-03-03 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2020-03-03 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/11/2020 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 50 |
2020-02-18 | House | Executive Session: 02/26/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2020-02-05 | House | Public Hearing: 02/12/2020 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-12-11 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 29 |