NH HB1627 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/31/2024; Chapter 33; eff: 07/01/2024 House Journal 15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/31/2024; Chapter 33; eff: 07/01/2024 House Journal 15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to recodifying certain laws concerning railroads, transportation, and telecommunications.
Title
Relative to recodifying certain laws concerning railroads, transportation, and telecommunications.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-04 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/31/2024; Chapter 33; eff: 07/01/2024 House Journal 15 |
2024-05-23 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/23/2024 House Journal 14 P. 176 |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/22/2024); Senate Journal 15 |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/18/2024; Senate Journal 10 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/18/2024, Vote 4-0; Senate Calendar 15 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Hearing: 03/06/2024, Room 103, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 9 |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced 02/15/2024 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 5 |
2024-02-01 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/01/2024 House Journal 3 P. 11 |
2024-01-17 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 01/16/2024 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 4 P. 10 |
2024-01-17 | House | Executive Session: 01/16/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 House Calendar 2 P. 8 |
2024-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 House Calendar 2 P. 7 |
2023-12-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 1 |