NH HB1624 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Signed by Governor Hassan 06/03/2016; Chapter 176; Eff. 1/1/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Signed by Governor Hassan 06/03/2016; Chapter 176; Eff. 1/1/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to electioneering by public employees.
Title
Relative to electioneering by public employees.
Sponsors
Sen. James Gray [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-10 | House | Signed by Governor Hassan 06/03/2016; Chapter 176; Eff. 1/1/2017 |
2016-05-23 | House | Enrolled 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 24 |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/19/2016); Senate Journal 19 |
2016-05-11 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1446s (Rep. Hoelzel): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 3 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1446s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/21/2016; Senate Journal 14 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Sen. Birdsell Floor Amendment #2016-1446s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/21/2016; Senate Journal 14 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Sen. Birdsell Moved to Reconsider the following action taken by this Body: Rescind Order to Third Reading, and Reconsider the Vote on Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted Voice Vote; 04/21/2016; Senate Journal 14 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/14/2016; Senate Journal 13 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/14/2016; Senate Calendar 14 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Hearing: 03/30/2016, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 12 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Introduced 03/10/2016 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 9 |
2016-03-09 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 22 |
2016-03-03 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/09/2016 (Vote 16-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 14 |
2016-02-18 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Executive Session: 03/01/2016 09:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2016-02-16 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 02/16/2016 09:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2016-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/19/2016 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building308 |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Election Law House Journal 4 P. 21 |