NH HB162 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Signed by the Governor on 6/2/2015; Chapter 60; Effective Date 8/1/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Signed by the Governor on 6/2/2015; Chapter 60; Effective Date 8/1/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Transferring authority for explosives and fireworks rules from the director of state police to the commissioner of safety.
Title
Transferring authority for explosives and fireworks rules from the director of state police to the commissioner of safety.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | House | Signed by the Governor on 6/2/2015; Chapter 60; Effective Date 8/1/2015 |
2015-05-13 | House | Enrolled (in recess of 5/6/2015); House Journal 41, PG. 1779 |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 5/7/2015); Senate Journal 14 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 12 |
2015-04-17 | Senate | === RESCHEDULED === Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/30/15; Senate Calendar 19 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | === CANCELLED SESSION === Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/23/15; Senate Calendar 18 |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Hearing: 4/8/15, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 16 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 9 |
2015-02-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0067h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG. 299 |
2015-02-11 | House | Adopt Amendment #0067h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG. 299 |
2015-02-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0067h for Feb 11 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar11, PG. 172 |
2015-01-29 | House | Executive Session: 2/3/2015 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2015-01-14 | House | Public Hearing: 1/22/2015 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 12, PG. 210 |