NH HB1616 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-31 - Interim Study Report: Recommended For Future Legislation (Vote 15-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-31 - Interim Study Report: Recommended For Future Legislation (Vote 15-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Making changes to the therapeutic cannabis laws.
Title
Making changes to the therapeutic cannabis laws.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-31 | House | Interim Study Report: Recommended For Future Legislation (Vote 15-1) |
2014-09-09 | House | Executive Session: 10/15/2014 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2014-09-03 | House | Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/23/2014 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2014-02-12 | House | Refer to Interim Study Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-12 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Failed Div 3-322 |
2014-02-12 | House | Adopt Amendment #0084h Amendment Failed Voice Vote |
2014-02-10 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2014-02-10 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0084h for Feb 12 (Vote 9-3; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 9 |
2014-01-30 | House | Executive Session: 2/04/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2014-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 1/16/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-12-19 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs |