NH HB1615 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Senate Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 12, Pg.450
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Senate Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 12, Pg.450
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to industrial hemp.
Title
Relative to industrial hemp.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Senate Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 12, Pg.450 | |
2012-04-26 | Senate Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 5/2/12; Senate Calendar 17 | |
2012-04-11 | Senate Hearing: 4/19/12, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 2:15 p.m.; Senate Calendar 15 | |
2012-03-28 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 9, Pg.334 | |
2012-03-07 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.1296 | |
2012-02-22 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 7 (Vote 15-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 18, PG.1061 | |
2012-02-15 | House Executive Session: 2/21/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2012-01-03 | House Public Hearing: 2/7/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2011-12-20 | House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 7, PG. 361 |