NH HB1612 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-18 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/12/2018; Chapter 252; Eff. 8/11/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to data security in schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to data security in schools.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-18HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 06/12/2018; Chapter 252; Eff. 8/11/2018
2018-05-29SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18
2018-05-29HouseEnrolled 05/23/2018
2018-05-10HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 1459s (Rep. Ladd): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018
2018-04-19SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2018-1459s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13
2018-04-19SenateCommittee Amendment # 2018-1459s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13
2018-04-11SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1459s, 04/19/2018; Senate Calendar 17
2018-03-29SenateHearing: 04/03/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:10 am; Senate Calendar 15
2018-03-14SenateIntroduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 7
2018-03-06HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 0754h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 77
2018-03-06HouseAmendment # 2018-0754h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 77
2018-02-28HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0754h for 03/06/2018 (Vote 14-5; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 38
2018-02-27HouseExecutive Session: 02/21/2018 Legislative Office Building 207
2018-01-09HousePublic Hearing: 01/17/2018 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207
2017-11-13HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 17

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback