NH HB1610 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on February 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-22 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG.1201
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on February 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-22 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG.1201
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to lowering the legal drinking age to 19 for active duty members of the armed forces.
Title
Relative to lowering the legal drinking age to 19 for active duty members of the armed forces.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-22 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG.1201 | |
2012-02-16 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 22 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 14, PG.800 | |
2012-01-11 | House =RESCHEDULED= Public Hearing: 2/14/2012 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 204 ==Executive Session To Follow== | |
2012-01-11 | House ===CANCELLED=== Public Hearing: 1/31/2012 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2011-12-19 | House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 7, PG. 361 |