NH HB1609 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-02 - House Signed by the Governor 07/01/2010; Effective 04/01/2010; Chapter 0237
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-02 - House Signed by the Governor 07/01/2010; Effective 04/01/2010; Chapter 0237
Summary
Relative to current use and the land use change tax.
Title
Relative to current use and the land use change tax.
Sponsors
Rep. Derek Owen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-02 | House Signed by the Governor 07/01/2010; Effective 04/01/2010; Chapter 0237 | |
2010-06-02 | Senate Enrolled | |
2010-06-02 | House Enrolled | |
2010-05-19 | House House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1662s (Rep Sad): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 46, PG.2226 | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1662s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Sen. Odell Floor Amendment 1662s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Sen. Odell Moved Remove From Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2010-04-28 | Senate Sen. Reynolds Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 16, Pg.338 | |
2010-04-28 | Senate Sen. Odell Floor Amendment 1662s, Not Voted On | |
2010-04-28 | Senate Committee Amendment 1402s, Amendment Failed, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 16, Pg.337 | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment 1402s, 4/28/10 | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Without Objection, Chair moved to Special Order to 04/28/10; Senate Journal 15, Pg.303 | |
2010-04-15 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment 1402s, 4/21/10; Senate Calendar 16 | |
2010-03-26 | Senate Hearing: April 1, 2010, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 8:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 13 | |
2010-03-17 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Energy, Environment and Economic Development, Senate Journal 10, Pg.172 | |
2010-03-03 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0604h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG.1137 | |
2010-03-03 | House Amendment #0604h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG.1137 | |
2010-02-18 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #0604h; House Calendar 17, PG.908 | |
2010-02-18 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0604h for Mar 3 Consent Calendar (Vote 16-0); House Calendar 17, PG.800 | |
2010-01-26 | House Executive Session: 2/11/2010 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 308 | |
2010-01-19 | House Public Hearing: 2/4/2010 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 308 | |
2009-12-10 | House Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to Environment and Agriculture; House Journal 6, PG.246 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2415&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |