NH HB1608 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting the manufacture, sale, transfer, and possession of large capacity ammunition feeding devices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting the manufacture, sale, transfer, and possession of large capacity ammunition feeding devices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - House - OTPA (Y: 150 N: 145 NV: 61 Abs: 40) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-16SenateIntroduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
2020-03-11HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2020-1037h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 150-145 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 161
2020-03-11HouseFLAM # 2020-1170h (Rep. Adjutant): Amendment Failed DV 153-157 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 161
2020-03-11HouseAmendment # 2020-1037h: Amendment Adopted DV 170-111 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 161
2020-03-05HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2020-03-05HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1037h for 03/11/2020 (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 44
2020-02-26House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/04/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 (if necessary)
2020-02-19HouseExecutive Session: 03/03/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 204
2020-02-06HousePublic Hearing: 02/12/2020 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 204
2020-01-21House==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 02/12/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 204
2019-12-06HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 1 P. 28

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback