NH HB1606 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-01 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-01 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to cruelty to a wild animal, fish, or wild bird.
Title
Relative to cruelty to a wild animal, fish, or wild bird.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-01 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 3 |
2020-05-15 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 05/21/2020 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using this link: https://www.zoom.us/j/96869508027 |
2020-05-14 | House | Executive Session: 05/21/2020 10:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link: https://zoom.us/j/96869508027 |
2020-02-26 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 03/17/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 204 |
2020-02-26 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 03/17/2020 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2020-02-19 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 58 |
2020-02-19 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0373h: Motion Adopted DV 214-137 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 58 |
2020-02-19 | House | Amendment # 2020-0373h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 58 |
2020-02-10 | House | Minority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study |
2020-02-10 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0373h for 02/19/2020 (Vote 9-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 21 |
2020-01-23 | House | Executive Session: 02/04/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2020-01-21 | House | Public Hearing: 01/28/2020 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-12-06 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Fish and Game and Marine Resources House Journal 1 P. 28 |