NH HB1592 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 29
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 29
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the health care premium contribution for retired state employees who are over 65 years of age, relative to funding of retiree health benefits, and making an appropriation to the department of administrative services.
Title
Relative to the health care premium contribution for retired state employees who are over 65 years of age, relative to funding of retiree health benefits, and making an appropriation to the department of administrative services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-09 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 29 |
2016-03-03 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/09/2016 (Vote 25-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 19 |
2016-02-19 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Executive Session: 03/02/2016 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2016-02-19 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 03/03/2016 09:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210 |
2016-02-03 | House | ==CONTINUED== Division I Work Session: 02/16/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 212 |
2016-02-10 | House | ==CANCELLED== Division I Work Session: 02/11/2016 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 212 |
2016-02-08 | House | ==RECESSED== Division I Work Session: 02/08/2016 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 212 |
2016-01-26 | House | Division I Work Session: 02/02/2016 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 212 |
2016-01-20 | House | Division I Work Session: 01/26/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 212 |
2016-02-11 | House | Vacated and Referred to Finance (Rep. Hess): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2016 House Journal 4 P. 27 |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Special Committee on Public Employee Pension Plans House Journal 4 P. 20 |