NH HB1592 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-24 - House Signed by the Governor 05/18/2010; Effective 07/17/2010; Chapter 0062
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-24 - House Signed by the Governor 05/18/2010; Effective 07/17/2010; Chapter 0062
Summary
Relative to the exemption from the charge for a municipal permit to register a motor vehicle for amputee and other disabled veterans.
Title
Relative to the exemption from the charge for a municipal permit to register a motor vehicle for amputee and other disabled veterans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-24 | House Signed by the Governor 05/18/2010; Effective 07/17/2010; Chapter 0062 | |
2010-04-12 | House Enrolled; House Journal 32, PG.1577 | |
2010-04-07 | Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 13, Pg.285 | |
2010-03-31 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 12, Pg.271 | |
2010-03-31 | Senate Ought to Pass, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 12, Pg.270 | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass 3/31/10; Senate Calendar 13 | |
2010-03-18 | Senate Hearing: March 25, 2010, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 12 | |
2010-03-10 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs | |
2010-02-17 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 18, PG.971 | |
2010-02-10 | House Special Ordered to Regular Place in Feb 17 Consent Calendar: Motion Adopted Without Objection; House Journal 16, PG.783 | |
2010-02-10 | House Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep Vaillancourt); House Journal 16, PG.748 | |
2010-02-02 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Feb 10 Consent Calendar (vote 14-0); House Calendar 13, PG.530 | |
2010-01-20 | House Executive Session: 1/28/2010 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303 | |
2009-12-16 | House Public Hearing: 1/14/2010 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 303 | |
2009-12-10 | House Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to Local and Regulated Revenues; House Journal 6, PG.245 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2260&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |