NH HB1584 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-22 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/12/2024; Chapter 203; eff.07/12/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-22 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/12/2024; Chapter 203; eff.07/12/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to home day care licensing requirements.
Title
Relative to home day care licensing requirements.
Sponsors
Rep. Katy Peternel [R] | Rep. Michael Vose [R] | Rep. Leah Cushman [R] | Rep. Margaret Drye [R] |
Rep. Sheila Seidel [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-22 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-22 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/12/2024; Chapter 203; eff.07/12/2024 |
2024-06-27 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 House Journal 16 |
2024-06-27 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/13/2024); Senate Journal 18 |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/22/2024; Senate Journal 14 |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/22/2024, Vote 3-2; Senate Calendar 20 |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Hearing: 05/08/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 19 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-21 | House | Reconsider HB1584 (Rep. Sweeney): Motion Failed DV 159-167 03/21/2024 House Journal 9 P. 126 |
2024-03-21 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2024 House Journal 9 P. 123 |
2024-03-21 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Failed DV 159-167 03/21/2024 House Journal 9 P. 123 |
2024-03-11 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2024-03-11 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 03/06/2024 (Vote 5-4; Regular Calendar) |
2024-02-28 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/06/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2024-02-15 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/21/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2024-01-31 | House | Public Hearing: 02/07/2024 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 209 |
2023-12-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Special Committee on Childcare House Journal 1 P. 25 |