NH HB1584 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 158-152 03/15/2018 House Journal 8 P. 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 158-152 03/15/2018 House Journal 8 P. 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to a landlord's ability to sell personal property of a commercial tenant.
Title
Relative to a landlord's ability to sell personal property of a commercial tenant.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 158-152 03/15/2018 House Journal 8 P. 11 |
2018-03-07 | House | Special Order to 3/15/2018 Without Objection House Journal 7 P. 49 |
2018-03-07 | House | Suspend House Rule 65 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by necessary two-thirds vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 125 |
2018-02-28 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2018-02-28 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 8-5; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 58 |
2018-02-28 | House | Executive Session: 02/21/2018 Legislative Office Building 208 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2018 02:30 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2017-11-13 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 1 P. 16 |