NH HB1577 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 188; Eff. 8/7/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the administration of anesthesia by dentists.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the administration of anesthesia by dentists.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-12HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 188; Eff. 8/7/2018
2018-05-15HouseEnrolled 05/10/2018
2018-05-11SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/10/2018); Senate Journal 18
2018-05-08SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1909e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/03/2018); Senate Journal 17
2018-05-08HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1909e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/03/2018
2018-04-26HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 1471s (Rep. Kotowski): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/26/2018 House Journal 14 P. 2
2018-04-19SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2018-1471s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13
2018-04-19SenateCommittee Amendment # 2018-1471s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13
2018-04-12SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1471s, 04/19/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17
2018-03-29SenateHearing: 04/03/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 15
2018-03-14SenateIntroduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 7
2018-03-06HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 0736h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 45
2018-03-06HouseAmendment # 2018-0736h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 45
2018-02-23HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0736h for 03/06/2018 (Vote 18-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 26
2018-02-21HouseExecutive Session: 02/21/2018 Legislative Office Building 205
2018-02-06HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/20/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2018-01-11HousePublic Hearing: 01/30/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2017-11-13HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 1 P. 16

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback