NH HB1573 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on August 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-06 - Signed by Governor Sununu 08/02/2024; Chapter 343; eff. 07/01/2024 House Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on August 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-06 - Signed by Governor Sununu 08/02/2024; Chapter 343; eff. 07/01/2024 House Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to out-of-home placements for children.
Title
Relative to out-of-home placements for children.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Pearson [R] | Rep. Jodi Nelson [R] | Rep. Sandra Panek [R] | Rep. Sheila Seidel [R] |
Rep. Peter Petrigno [D] | Rep. Alicia Gregg [D] | Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] | Sen. Daniel Innis [R] |
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-06 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 08/02/2024; Chapter 343; eff. 07/01/2024 House Journal 16 |
2024-07-23 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2024-2372e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 06/13/2024 House Journal 16 |
2024-07-23 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 House Journal 16 |
2024-07-18 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/13/2024); Senate Journal 18 |
2024-07-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2024-2372e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/13/2024); Senate Journal 18 |
2024-06-13 | House | Conference Committee Report 2024-2290c: Adopted, Voice Vote 06/13/2024 House Journal 16 |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2024-2290c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/13/2024; Senate Journal 17 |
2024-06-06 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Filed, # 2024-2290c; 06/13/2024 |
2024-06-06 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 06/06/2024 10:10 am State House 100 |
2024-06-03 | House | Conferee Change: Rep. Gregg Replaces Long 06/03/2024 House Journal 15 P. 34 |
2024-06-03 | House | ==CANCELLED== Conference Committee Meeting: 06/03/2024 10:30 am State House 100 |
2024-06-03 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 06/03/2024 09:10 am State House 100 |
2024-05-30 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Carson, Gannon, Whitley; 05/30/2024; Senate Journal 16 |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Sen. Carson Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/30/2024; Senate Journal 16 |
2024-05-29 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 2024-2092s and Requests CofC (Reps. M. Pearson, Hoell, Wallner, Long): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/29/2024 House Journal 14 P. 180 |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-2092s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/23/2024; Senate Journal 15 |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Sen. Carson Floor Amendment # 2024-2092s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2024; Senate Journal 15 |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Special Order to 05/23/2024, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/22/2024 Senate Journal 14 |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/22/2024, Vote 7-0; Senate Calendar 20A |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1877s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 05/15/2024; Senate Journal 12 |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-1877s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2024; Senate Journal 12 |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2024-1877s, 05/16/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 19 |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Hearing: 04/23/2024, Room 100, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 16 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Introduced 04/11/2024 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 10 |
2024-04-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1309h and 2024-1472h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/11/2024 House Journal 11 P. 49 |
2024-04-11 | House | FLAM # 2024-1472h (Rep. Wallner): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/11/2024 House Journal 11 P. 48 |
2024-04-11 | House | Amendment # 2024-1309h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/11/2024 House Journal 11 P. 47 |
2024-04-03 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1313h |
2024-04-03 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1309h 04/02/2024 (Vote 13-11; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 12 |
2024-03-21 | House | Executive Session: 03/26/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2024-03-12 | House | Division Work Session: 03/22/2024 12:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2024-03-12 | House | Division Work Session: 03/18/2024 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2024-03-11 | House | Division Work Session: 03/13/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2024-03-07 | House | Division Work Session: 03/11/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2024-02-28 | House | Division Work Session: 03/06/2024 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2024-02-22 | House | Referred to Finance 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 P. 27 |
2024-02-22 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0427h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 P. 27 |
2024-02-22 | House | Amendment # 2024-0427h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 P. 27 |
2024-02-09 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0427h 02/06/2024 (Vote 15-0; Regular Calendar) |
2024-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 02/06/2024 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2024-01-24 | House | Public Hearing: 02/06/2024 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-12-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 1 P. 25 |