NH HB1565 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/02/2018; Chapter 353; Eff. 07/02/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the secure psychiatric unit to be accredited as a behavioral health facility.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring the secure psychiatric unit to be accredited as a behavioral health facility.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-10 - House - Concur (Y: 158 N: 183 NV: 19 Abs: 31) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - House - Sen. Feltes Floor Amendment 1874s (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-26 - House - Floor Amendment (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-10HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 07/02/2018; Chapter 353; Eff. 07/02/2018
2018-06-13SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18
2018-06-11HouseEnrolled 05/23/2018
2018-06-06SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2119e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18
2018-06-06HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2119e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2018
2018-05-23HouseConference Committee Report 1981c: Adopted, Voice Vote 05/23/2018
2018-05-23SenateConference Committee Report # 2018-1981c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2018; Senate Journal 18
2018-05-16SenateConference Committee Report Filed, # 2018-1981c; 05/16/2018
2018-05-10HouseConference Committee Meeting: 05/14/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306
2018-05-10SenatePresident Appoints: Senators Avard, Gray, Fuller Clark; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17
2018-05-10SenateSen. Bradley Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17
2018-05-10HouseSpeaker Appoints: Reps. McGuire, P. Schmidt, Sytek, Beaudoin 05/10/2018
2018-05-10HouseHouse Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1636s and Requests CofC (Rep. Cushing): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018
2018-05-10HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 1636s (Rep. McGuire): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 158-183 05/10/2018
2018-05-03SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16
2018-05-03SenateSen. Feltes Floor Amendment # 2018-1874s, Regular Calendar 10Y-14N, Amendment Failed; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16
2018-05-02SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/03/2018;
2018-05-02SenateSpecial Order to 05/03/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/02/2018 Senate Journal 15
2018-04-30SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2018; Senate Calendar 19A
2018-04-26SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2018-1636s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14
2018-04-26SenateSen. Hennessey Floor Amendment # 2018-1804s, Regular Calendar 10Y-14N, Amendment Failed; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14
2018-04-26SenateCommittee Amendment # 2018-1636s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14
2018-04-18SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1636s, 04/26/2018; Senate Calendar 18
2018-03-22SenateHearing: 03/27/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 14
2018-03-14SenateIntroduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 7
2018-02-22HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 0348h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 32
2018-02-22HouseAmendment # 2018-0348h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 32
2018-02-14HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0348h (NT) for 02/22/2018 (Vote 20-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 17
2018-02-14HouseExecutive Session: 01/30/2018 Legislative Office Building 306
2018-01-17HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 01/24/2018 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 308
2018-01-10HousePublic Hearing: 01/17/2018 02:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306
2017-11-09HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 P. 15

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2184&sy=2018&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB1565
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&id=1197&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&txtFormat=html&v=HA&id=1197
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=1197
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=195&sy=2018&lb=S&eb=HB1565&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB1565&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2184
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=234&sy=2018&lb=S&eb=HB1565&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB1565&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2184
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=229&sy=2018&lb=H&eb=HB1565&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB1565&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2184

Bill Comments

feedback