NH HB1561 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on November 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 101
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 101
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the use of recycled tire rubber at village, town, municipal, and school playgrounds.
Title
Relative to the use of recycled tire rubber at village, town, municipal, and school playgrounds.
Sponsors
Rep. Mindi Messmer [D] | Rep. Chuck Grassie [D] | Rep. Suzanne Smith [D] | Rep. Valerie Fraser [R] |
Rep. James McConnell [R] | Sen. David Watters [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 101 |
2018-02-28 | House | Minority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study |
2018-02-28 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 15-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 45 |
2018-01-11 | House | ==TIME CHANGE== Executive Session: 02/13/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/31/2018 02:30 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2017-11-09 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 1 P. 15 |