NH HB1558 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on November 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-09-24 - Executive Session: 10/10/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building202
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the payment of the meals and rooms tax by individuals renting cars through an online service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the payment of the meals and rooms tax by individuals renting cars through an online service.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-24HouseExecutive Session: 10/10/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building202
2018-09-05HouseInterim Study Full Committee Work Session: 09/20/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2018-08-28House==CANCELLED== Interim Study Full Committee Work Session: 09/19/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building202
2018-03-06HouseRefer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 60
2018-02-27HouseCommittee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 03/06/2018 (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 35
2018-02-27HouseExecutive Session: 02/21/2018 Legislative Office Building 202
2018-02-08HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/13/2018 01:05 PM Legislative Office Building 104
2018-01-24HouseFull Committee Work Session: 01/30/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202
2018-01-03HousePublic Hearing: 01/30/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2017-11-09HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 1 P. 15

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback