NH HB1558 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-03 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 15, PG.676
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-03 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 15, PG.676
Summary
Prohibiting the sale of certain energy drinks to minors.
Title
Prohibiting the sale of certain energy drinks to minors.
Sponsors
Rep. Julie Brown [R] | Rep. William Butynski [D] | Rep. Barbara French [D] | Rep. Carolyn Gargasz [R] |
Rep. Barbara Richardson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-03 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 15, PG.676 | |
2010-01-28 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 3 Regular Calendar (vote 17-2); House Calendar 11, PG.467 | |
2010-01-20 | House Executive Session: 1/26/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2010-01-19 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 1/26/2010 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2010-01-07 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 1/19/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 (Members: Reps Gidge, Hammond, & Nevins) | |
2010-01-06 | House Public Hearing: 1/7/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2010-01-06 | House Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 6, PG.244 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2333&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |