NH HB1553 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/31/2022; Senate Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/31/2022; Senate Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to roadside memorials.
Title
Relative to roadside memorials.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/31/2022; Senate Journal 7 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; 03/31/2022; Senate Calendar 13 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Hearing: 03/15/2022, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:30 pm; Senate Calendar 11 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Introduced 02/24/2022 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-02-16 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-01-27 | House | Executive Session: 01/12/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-01-14 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 01/12/2022 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2021-12-14 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Public Works and Highways |