NH HB1550 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-26 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/19/2024; Chapter 249; eff. 07/19/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-26 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/19/2024; Chapter 249; eff. 07/19/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing municipalities to reduce speed limits seasonally.
Title
Authorizing municipalities to reduce speed limits seasonally.
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Ebel [D] | Rep. Mark McConkey [R] | Rep. Jaci Grote [D] | Rep. Catherine Rombeau [D] |
Rep. Karel Crawford [R] | Rep. Dan Wolf [R] | Rep. Michael Edgar [D] | Rep. Cam Kenney [D] |
Rep. David Milz [R] | Sen. Ruth Ward [R] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Suzanne Prentiss [D] |
Sen. Howard Pearl [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-26 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/19/2024; Chapter 249; eff. 07/19/2024 |
2024-07-02 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 House Journal 16 |
2024-07-02 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/13/2024); Senate Journal 18 |
2024-05-31 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2024-1527s (Rep. T. Walsh): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/30/2024 House Journal 15 P. 25 |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1527s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/18/2024; Senate Journal 10 |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Sen. Gray Floor Amendment # 2024-1527s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/18/2024; Senate Journal 10 |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-1518s, Amendment Failed, Voice Vote; 04/18/2024; Senate Journal 10 |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Sen. Gray Moved to Remove HB 1550 from the Consent Calendar; 04/18/2024; Senate Journal 10 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1518s, 04/18/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 15A |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Hearing: 03/26/2024, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 10:10 am; Senate Calendar 12 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Introduced 03/07/2024 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 7 |
2024-03-07 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0651h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2024 House Journal 7 P. 25 |
2024-03-07 | House | Amendment # 2024-0651h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2024 House Journal 7 P. 25 |
2024-02-20 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0651h 02/13/2024 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 15 |
2024-02-07 | House | Executive Session: 02/13/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2024-01-31 | House | Public Hearing: 02/06/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2023-12-11 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Transportation House Journal 1 P. 24 |