NH HB155 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - House Signed By Governor 05/27/2011; Effective 07/01/2011; Chapter 0094
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - House Signed By Governor 05/27/2011; Effective 07/01/2011; Chapter 0094
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to permits to conduct raffles.
Title
Relative to permits to conduct raffles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-01 | House Signed By Governor 05/27/2011; Effective 07/01/2011; Chapter 0094 | |
2011-05-18 | House Enrolled; House Journal 44, PG.1564 | |
2011-05-18 | Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 18, Pg.364 | |
2011-05-04 | House House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1266s (Rep Ferrante): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 42, PG.1448 | |
2011-04-13 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 12, Pg.254 | |
2011-04-13 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1266s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 12, Pg.251 | |
2011-04-13 | Senate Committee Amendment 1266s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 12, Pg.251 | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2011-1266s, 4/13/11; Senate Calendar 19 | |
2011-03-24 | Senate Hearing: === RECONVENE === 3/29/11, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 9:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 17 | |
2011-03-24 | Senate Hearing: === RECESSED === 3/22/11, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 9:15 a.m. | |
2011-03-17 | Senate Hearing: 3/22/11, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 9:45 a.m.; Senate Calendar 16 | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs | |
2011-02-09 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.324 | |
2011-02-01 | House Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar 12, PG.208 | |
2011-02-01 | House Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Feb 9 (Vote 12-4; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 12, PG.208 | |
2011-01-19 | House Executive Session: 1/27/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 | |
2011-01-19 | House ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 1/25/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 (Orig 11:00 Amendment) | |
2011-01-11 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Municipal and County Government |