NH HB1549 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-22 - Executive Session: 01/28/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 207
Pending: House Education Committee
Hearing: Jan 28 @ 1:00 pm in Legislative Office Building 207
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing the office of school counseling and psychology, establishing the position of school counselor coordinator, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the office of school counseling and psychology, establishing the position of school counselor coordinator, and making an appropriation therefor.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-22HouseExecutive Session: 01/28/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 207
2020-01-14House==CONTINUED== Public Hearing: 01/21/2020 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 207
2020-01-08House==RECESSED== Public Hearing: 01/14/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 207
2019-12-03HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Education

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback