NH HB1547 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on June 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-28 - Signed by Governor Hassan 06/24/2016; Chapter 321; Eff. 1/1/2017 at 12:01 am
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on June 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-28 - Signed by Governor Hassan 06/24/2016; Chapter 321; Eff. 1/1/2017 at 12:01 am
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting bestiality.
Title
Prohibiting bestiality.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-28 | House | Signed by Governor Hassan 06/24/2016; Chapter 321; Eff. 1/1/2017 at 12:01 am |
2016-06-16 | House | Enrolled 06/16/2016 |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/16/2016); Senate Journal 20 |
2016-06-15 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2016-2165e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2016 House Journal 42 P. 66 |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2016-2165e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/01/2016); Senate Journal 20 |
2016-06-01 | House | Conference Committee Report 2044c: Adopted, Voice Vote 06/01/2016 House Journal 42 P. 48 |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 2044c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/01/2016 Senate Journal 19 |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Filed, #2016-2044c; 05/26/2016 |
2016-05-20 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 05/24/2016 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2016-05-19 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Carson, Daniels, Pierce; 05/19/2016; Senate Journal 18 |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Sen. Carson Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/19/2016; Senate Journal 18 |
2016-05-11 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Tholl, Welch, DiSesa, Cushing 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 5 |
2016-05-11 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1376s and Requests CofC (Rep. Tholl): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 5 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1376s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/21/2016; Senate Journal 14 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1376s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/21/2016 Senate Journal 14 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-1376s, 04/21/2016; Senate Calendar 15 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Hearing: 03/29/2016, Room 100, State House, 09:40 am; Senate Calendar 12 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Introduced 03/17/2016 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 10 |
2016-03-10 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0775h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2016 House Journal 25 P. 83 |
2016-03-10 | House | Amendment #2016-0775h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2016 House Journal 25 P. 83 |
2016-03-03 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0775h (NT) for 03/09/2016 (Vote 15-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 86 |
2016-02-25 | House | Executive Session: 03/01/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2016-02-02 | House | Public Hearing: 02/29/2016 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 4 P. 18 |