NH HB1541 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2018 House Journal 9 P. 39
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to registration and road toll fees for hybrid and electric vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to registration and road toll fees for hybrid and electric vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-21 - House - OTPA (Y: 158 N: 178 NV: 24 Abs: 32) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2018 House Journal 9 P. 39
2018-03-21HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 0483h: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 158-178 03/21/2018 House Journal 9 P. 37
2018-03-21HouseAmendment # 2018-0483h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2018 House Journal 9 P. 36
2018-03-16HouseSuspend House Rule 65; extending deadline for action to 3/22/2018 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by necessary two-thirds vote 03/15/2018 House Journal 8 P. 69
2018-03-08HouseSpecial Order to 3/15/2018 Without Objection House Journal 7 P. 49
2018-03-08HouseSuspend House Rule 65 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by necessary two-thirds vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 125
2018-02-14HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2018-02-14HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0483h for 03/06/2018 (Vote 19-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 74
2018-02-14HouseExecutive Session: 02/06/2018 Legislative Office Building 201
2018-01-31HouseFull Committee Work Session: 02/06/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201
2018-01-03HousePublic Hearing: 01/11/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201
2017-11-06HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Public Works and Highways House Journal 1 P. 14

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback