NH HB1537 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-02 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-02 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to a second opinion on health care matters for state or county prisoners.
Title
Relative to a second opinion on health care matters for state or county prisoners.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 05/02/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 19 |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Hearing: 04/09/2018, Room 100, State House, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 16 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Introduced 02/15/2018 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 5 |
2018-02-08 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 3 |
2018-01-31 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/07/2018 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 6 |
2018-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 01/30/2018 Legislative Office Building 204 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/30/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2017-11-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 1 P. 14 |